François_de_Vial
François de Vial (October 4, 1904 – May 16, 1984) was a diplomat and a Minister Plenipotentiary of France.
François de Vial (October 4, 1904 – May 16, 1984) was a diplomat and a Minister Plenipotentiary of France.
Jacques Senard (21 November 1919 – 22 September 2020) was a French diplomat.
Henry de Jouvenel des Ursins (5 April 1876 – 5 October 1935) was a French journalist and statesman. He was the French High Commissioner in Syria and Lebanon from 23 December 1925 until 23 June 1926.
Maurice Gourdault-Montagne CMG, CVO (born on 16 November 1953) is a career diplomat and former French Ambassador to China, Japan, the United Kingdom and Germany.
Roger Seydoux (28 March 1908 in Paris – 3 July 1985 in Paris) was a French academic and diplomat.
Gérard Araud (born 20 February 1953) is a retired French diplomat who served as Ambassador of France to the United States from 2014 to 2019. He previously served as Director General for Political and Security Affairs of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs (2006–2009) and France's permanent representative to the United Nations (2009–2014).
Hervé Alphand (31 May 1907 – 13 January 1994) was a French diplomat, and French ambassador to the United States, from 1956 to 1965.