Jean-Luc_Romero
Jean-Luc Romero (born 30 June 1959) is a French politician, writer and NGO leader.
Jean-Luc Romero (born 30 June 1959) is a French politician, writer and NGO leader.
Martine Billard (born 7 October 1952 in Boulogne-Billancourt, Hauts-de-Seine) is a French politician and a deputy to the National Assembly of France. She is a member of the Parti de Gauche.
Manuel Aeschlimann (born 22 October 1964 in Asnières-sur-Seine in the Ile de France area, near Paris, France) is a French politician.
He began his political career at the early age of 25, as a city councillor in Asnières-sur-Seine. He was appointed first deputy major and went on to be elected mayor of Asnières in 1999. He was defeated when he sought re-election in 2008.
He was elected deputy to the French National Assembly in June 2002 as a member of the ruling right-wing party UMP. On 17 June 2007, he was re-elected deputy with 56.2% of the vote.
He is a close friend of the French President Nicolas Sarkozy, of whom he was the political adviser in his successful race for president. Mr. Sarkozy is also the godfather of his first son.
Maurice Gourdault-Montagne CMG, CVO (born on 16 November 1953) is a career diplomat and former French Ambassador to China, Japan, the United Kingdom and Germany.
Louis Joachim Marie François Giscard d'Estaing (born 20 October 1958) is a French politician and former member of the National Assembly of France. He is the son of the late President of France Valéry Giscard d'Estaing (1926–2020) and Anne-Aymone Giscard d'Estaing (née Sauvage de Brantes). He was a deputy for the Puy-de-Dôme department from 2002, when he held his father's old seat on his retirement, until 2012 when he was defeated by the Green candidate Danielle Auroi. He remains mayor of Chamalières, a post he has held since 2005. His father had also been mayor of Chamalières from 1967 to 1974.
He was married to musicologist Nawal-Alexandra Ebeid (1959–2011) from 1996 until her death in 2011. She was born in Pasadena, California in 1959 and was a graduate of George Washington University. The couple had one son, Pierre-Louis Giscard d'Estaing. He remarried to Claire Labic in 2016.
Henri Marie Edmond Valéry Giscard d'Estaing (born 17 October 1956) is a French businessman and son of former French President Valéry Giscard d'Estaing.
Jean-Marie Colombani (born 7 July 1948 in Dakar, Senegal) is a French journalist, and was the editor-in-chief of the daily newspaper Le Monde from 1994 until 2007.
Yves Jégo (French: [iv ʒeɡo]; born 17 April 1961) is a French former politician. He was député for the third constituency of Seine-et-Marne in the National Assembly from 2002 to 2018, Mayor of Montereau-Fault-Yonne since 1995, and president of the Communauté de communes des Deux Fleuves.
He was the general delegate of the Union of Democrats and Independents, from the party's creation in October 2012. He was also vice president of the Radical Party. Jégo was the spokesman for the Union for a Popular Movement, when that party was ruling. He is also founder and president of a local party Mieux Vivre Ensemble (MVE), formerly known as Mouvement des Seine-et-Marnais (MdSM).
Jégo was appointed Secretary of State for Overseas in the government of François Fillon on 18 March 2008. He was therefore the Minister in charge of French Oversea territories during the 2009 French Caribbean protests and general strikes against high living costs and particularly the costs of food and fuel. As he undertook the dismantling of monopolies, his role was the subject of controversy. He was replaced by Marie-Luce Penchard on 23 June 2009 and was not given another portfolio.
He announced in June 2018 that he would retire from politics and as a deputy in mid-July 2018. As of early 2023, he is the executive director (Délégué Général) of the Avec financial group, which is under investigation for alleged illegal asset stripping.
Bernard Carayon (born 1 October 1957, in Paris) was a member of the French parliament. First elected in Tarn in 1993; he has been then reelected in 2002 and 2007. He is also mayor of Lavaur, a historic city near Toulouse, since 1995.
He is a member of the Union for a Popular Movement. Since 2009, he has been a lecturer at SciencesPo Paris in the department of public affairs.
With a focus on the questions of globalization, he has written two books entitled "Patriotisme économique" and "Changeons le monde" ("Let's change the world").
Together with a socialist MP he started a foundation called "Prometheus". Supported by a dozen prominent French companies, Prometheus tries to bridge the gap between the private and the public reflexions about globalization in order to build a genuine economic strategy for France and Europe.
Yves Bot (August 22, 1947 – June 9, 2019) was a French magistrate who served until his death as Advocate General at the European Court of Justice.