Antônio_Celso_Queiroz
Antônio Celso Queiroz (24 November 1933 – 16 April 2023) was a Brazilian Catholic prelate. He was auxiliary bishop of the Archdiocese of São Paulo from 1975 to 2000 and bishop of the Diocese Catanduva from 2000 to 2009.
Antônio Celso Queiroz (24 November 1933 – 16 April 2023) was a Brazilian Catholic prelate. He was auxiliary bishop of the Archdiocese of São Paulo from 1975 to 2000 and bishop of the Diocese Catanduva from 2000 to 2009.
Lawrence Donald Soens (August 26, 1926 – November 1, 2021) was an American prelate of the Roman Catholic Church. In 2008, the Diocese of Davenport in Iowa announced multiple credible accusations that Soens had sexually abused children as a priest. He served as bishop of the Diocese of Sioux City in Iowa from 1983 to 1998.
Gerald Richard Barnes (born June 22, 1945) is an American prelate of the Roman Catholic Church who served as bishop of the Diocese of San Bernardino in California from 1996 to 2020 and as an auxiliary bishop of the Diocese of San Bernardino from 1992 to 1996.
James John Hogan (October 17, 1911 – June 14, 2005) was an American prelate of the Roman Catholic Church who served as the sixth bishop of the Diocese of Altoona-Johnstown in Pennsylvania (1966–1986). He previously served as an auxiliary bishop of the Diocese of Trenton in New Jersey (1959–1966).
Thomas Joseph O'Brien (November 29, 1935 – August 26, 2018) was an American prelate of the Roman Catholic Church. He served as Bishop of Phoenix from 1982 to 2003.
O'Brien resigned as bishop in 2003 after his involvement in a fatal hit-and-run accident.
Paul Edward Waldschmidt CSC (January 7, 1920 – October 20, 1994) was an American prelate of the Catholic Church who served as an auxiliary bishop of the Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon from 1978 to 1990.
Fermín de Francisco Lasuén de Arasqueta (7 June 1736 – Mission de San Carlos (California), 26 June 1803) was a Basque Franciscan missionary to Alta California president of the Franciscan missions there, and founder of nine of the twenty-one Spanish missions in California.
Fernando Ocáriz Braña (born 27 October 1944) is a priest of the Catholic Church who has been the prelate of Opus Dei since 2017. Ocáriz is the fourth person to head Opus Dei since its founding in 1928. He is widely published in philosophy and has been a consultor of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith since 1986.
Giuseppe Fietta (6 November 1883 – 1 October 1960) was an Italian prelate of the Catholic Church who worked in the diplomatic service of the Holy See from 1924 to 1958, including a stint as Apostolic Nuncio to Argentina from 1936 to 1953. He was made a cardinal in 1958.
Aleksander Kakowski (Polish pronunciation: [alɛˈksandɛr kaˈkɔfskʲi]; 5 February 1862 – 30 December 1938) was a Polish politician, diplomat, a member of the Regency Council and, as Cardinal and Archbishop of Warsaw, the last titular Primate of the Kingdom of Poland before Poland fully regained its independence in 1918.