William_J._Whalen
William Joseph Whalen (January 1, 1926 – March 25, 2008) was a nationally known US non-fiction writer and an expert on comparative religion.
William Joseph Whalen (January 1, 1926 – March 25, 2008) was a nationally known US non-fiction writer and an expert on comparative religion.
Monsignor Júlio Renato Lancellotti, GCONM (born December 27, 1948) is a Brazilian Catholic educator and priest, Monsignor and parish priest of the São Miguel Arcanjo Church in the Mooca neighborhood, in the city of São Paulo. In addition to the parish, he is also responsible for the masses held in the chapel of the Universidade São Judas Tadeu, located in the same neighborhood.
Lancelotti is known by his work with homeless and vulnerable people, children and adolescents, with the Pastoral do Povo da Rua (Pastoral of the People of the Street).
Antônio Celso Queiroz (24 November 1933 – 16 April 2023) was a Brazilian Catholic prelate. He was auxiliary bishop of the Archdiocese of São Paulo from 1975 to 2000 and bishop of the Diocese Catanduva from 2000 to 2009.
Louis L. Merz (July 20, 1908 – September 22, 2002) was a member of the Wisconsin State Assembly.
Marie-France Banc (1876 – 1965) was a Catholic Mother Superior in France, recognized as Righteous Among the Nations, for protecting two Jewish children for the last two years of World War II.
Paulo Roberto Freire da Costa (born 4 February 1955) is a Brazilian politician and pastor. He has spent his political career representing São Paulo, having served as state representative since 2011.
Lawrence Donald Soens (August 26, 1926 – November 1, 2021) was an American prelate of the Roman Catholic Church. In 2008, the Diocese of Davenport in Iowa announced multiple credible accusations that Soens had sexually abused children as a priest. He served as bishop of the Diocese of Sioux City in Iowa from 1983 to 1998.
Gerald Richard Barnes (born June 22, 1945) is an American prelate of the Roman Catholic Church who served as bishop of the Diocese of San Bernardino in California from 1996 to 2020 and as an auxiliary bishop of the Diocese of San Bernardino from 1992 to 1996.